No. 18-581
Vide 18-575
Title:Argentine Republic, Petitioner
v.
Petersen Energia Inversora S.A.U., et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3303, 16-3304)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 3, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2018.
Dec 03 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Republic of Chile filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Brief amici curiae of Professors at Law and Business Schools filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018Brief of respondents Petersen Energía Inversora, S.A.U., et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2018Reply of petitioner Argentine Republic filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maura Barry Grinalds
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Aprs, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
Four Times Square
New York, NY 10036

maurabarry.grinalds@skadden.com
212-735-3000
Party name: Argentine Republic
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7902
Party name: Petersen Energía Inversora, S.A.U., et al.
Other
Joseph Robert Guerra
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jguerra@sidley.com
202-736-8228
Party name: Government of the United Mexican States
Paul S. Reichler
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

preichler@foleyhoag.com
202.223.1200
Party name: The Republic of Chile
Andres Rivero
    Counsel of Record
Rivero Mestre LLP
2525 Ponce de Leon Blvd., Suite 1000
Miami, FL 33134

arivero@riveromestre.com
305-442-2500
Party name: Professors at Law and Business Schools