No. 18-580
Title:Nu Image, Inc., Petitioner
v.
International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55451)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Corporate Disclosure Statement received.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 3, 2018 to December 24, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 26, 2018.
Dec 26 2018Brief of respondents Int'l Alliance of Theatrical Stage Eployees, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Reply of Nu Image, Inc. not accepted for filing. (January 10, 2019 - Reply brief to be corrected and re-submitted)
Jan 08 2019Reply of petitioner Nu Image, Inc. filed. (1/9/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin David Katz
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP
1901 Avenue of the Stars, 16th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067

mkatz@sheppardmullin.com
310-228-3700
Party name: Nu Image, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
David A. Rosenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Weinberg, Roger & Rosenfeld
1001 Marina Village Parkway
Suite 200
Alameda, CA 94501

drosenfeld@unioncounsel.net
(510) 337-1001
Party name: Int'l Alliance of Theatrical Stage Eployees, et al.