No. 18-579
Title:Alaska Airlines, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Judy Schurke, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-35574)
   Decision Date:August 1, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Waiver of Judy Schurke, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (November 30, 2018 - Corrected waiver to be submitted)
Nov 26 2018Waiver of right of respondents Association of Flight Attendants-Communication Workers of America, AFL-CIO to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Waiver of right of respondents Judy Schurke, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 03 2018Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 26 2018Response Requested. (Due January 25, 2019)
Dec 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Association for American Railroads, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2019 to February 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 17 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 25, 2019, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kathleen Phair Barnard
    Counsel of Record
Schwerin Campbell Barnard Iglitzin & Lavitt
18 W. Mercer St.
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98119

barnard@workerlaw.com
2062576002
Party name: Association of Flight Attendats - Communications Workers of America, AFL-CIO
Peter Benjamin Gonick
    Counsel of Record
Attorney General of Washington
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504

peterg@atg.wa.gov
3607536245
Party name: Judy Schurke, et al.
Other
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Association for American Railroads and U.S. Chamber of Commerce
Robert A. Siegel
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
400 South Hope Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

rsiegel@omm.com
(213) 430-6005
Party name: Airlines for America