No. 18-560
Title:Peaje Investments LLC, Petitioner
v.
The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.
Docketed:October 30, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2165, 17-2166, 17-2167)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2018 to December 31, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2019.
Jan 02 2019Brief of respondents The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2019Reply of Peaje Investments LLC submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George Eric Brunstad
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
90 State House Square
Hartford, CT 06013

Eric.Brunstad@dechert.com
860-524-3999
Party name: Peaje Investments LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Martin J. Bienenstock
    Counsel of Record
Proskauer Rose LLP
Eleven Times Square
New York, NY 10036

mbienenstock@proskauer.com
(212) 969-4530
Party name: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, et al.