No. 18-56 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tim Shoop, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Danny Hill
Docketed:July 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(99-4317, 14-3718)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 9, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2018 to August 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 30, 2018.
Aug 29 2018Brief of respondent Danny Hill in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 29 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Danny Hill.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 10 2018Reply of petitioner Tim Shoop, Warden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric E. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Ohio State Solicitor
30 East Broad Street
17th Floor
Columbus, OH 43215

eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
614-466-8980
Party name: Tim Shoop, Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Vicki Ruth Adams Werneke
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender, Northern District of Ohio
1660 W. 2nd Street
Suite 750
Cleveland, OH 44143

vicki_werneke@fd.org
216-861-3926
Party name: Danny Hill