No. 18-556
Title:Kansas, Petitioner
v.
Charles Glover
Docketed:October 29, 2018
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kansas
   Case Numbers:(116,446)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Waiver of right of respondent Charles Glover to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 28 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Response Requested. (Due January 18, 2019)
Jan 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 18, 2019 to February 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 09 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 19, 2019.
Feb 19 2019Brief of respondent Charles Glover in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 05 2019Reply of petitioner Kansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785.368.6693
Party name: Kansas
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Elaine Harrington
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

sharrington@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Charles Glover
Other
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: States of Oklahoma, et al.