No. 18-547
Title:Melissa Elaine Klein, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Docketed:October 26, 2018
Linked with 18A246
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Oregon
   Case Numbers:(A159899)
   Decision Date:December 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 21, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2018Application (18A246) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 19, 2018 to October 19, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 12 2018Application (18A246) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 19, 2018.
Oct 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 31 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries.
Blanket Consent
Nov 08 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Melissa Elaine Klein, et vir.
Blanket Consent
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Faith and Family filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 26, 2018 to December 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 26, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 26 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et. al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 25, 2019.
Jan 25 2019Brief of respondent Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Reply of petitioners Melissa Elaine Klein, et vir filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Feb 28 2019Rescheduled.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 14 2019Rescheduled.
Mar 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 21 2019Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam Rabun Gustafson
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, NW, Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

gustafson@boydengrayassociates.com
202-955-0620
Party name: Melissa Elaine Klein, et vir
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court St NE
Salem, OR 97232

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: Oregon Bureau of Labor and Industries
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et. al
Stephen M. Crampton
    Counsel of Record
Crampton Legal Services, PLLC
P.O. Box 4506
Tupelo, MS 38803

smcrampton@hotmail.com
6622559439
Party name: Thomas More Society
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
9103264554
Party name: Institute for Faith and Family
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
3343241812
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Wencong Fa
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

wfa@pacificlegal.org
9164197111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: THE STATES OF TEXAS, ALABAMA, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, LOUISIANA, NEBRASKA, NEVADA, OKLAHOMA, SOUTH CAROLINA, UTAH, AND WEST VIRGINIA
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, One Nation Under God Foundation, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: THE CATO INSTITUTE AND COMMITTEE FOR JUSTICE