No. 18-546
Title:Brian E. Frosh, Attorney General of Maryland, et al., Petitioners
v.
Association for Accessible Medicines
Docketed:October 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2166)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 24, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Brian Frosh, et al..
Blanket Consent
Nov 05 2018Waiver of right of respondent Association for Accessible Medicines to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Association for Accessible Medicines.
Blanket Consent
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 13 2018Response Requested. (Due December 13, 2018)
Nov 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 14, 2019.
Nov 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Gerard F. Anderson; Joshua M. Sharfstein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Julia Doyle Bernhardt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
200 Saint Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

jbernhardt@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7291
Party name: Brian Frosh, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jay Philip Lefkowitz
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

lefkowitz@kirkland.com
+12124464800
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
Other
James Dabney Miller
    Counsel of Record
James Dabney Miller
4110 Greenway
Baltimore, MD 21218

jmill165@jhu.edu
410-458-5445
Party name: Gerard F. Anderson; Joshua M. Sharfstein