No. 18-540
Title:Leslie Rutledge, Attorney General of Arkansas, Petitioner
v.
Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Docketed:October 24, 2018
Linked with 18A130
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1609)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 01 2018Application (18A130) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2018 to October 8, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 03 2018Application (18A130) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 8, 2018.
Sep 26 2018Application (18A130) to extend further the time from October 8, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Application (18A130) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until October 22, 2018.
Oct 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 23, 2018 to January 7, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 7, 2019.
Nov 21 2018Brief amici curiae of States of California, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2019 to January 24, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 24, 2019.
Jan 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 24, 2019 to February 28, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 28, 2019.
Feb 28 2019Brief of respondent Pharmaceutical Care Management Association in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 18 2019Reply of petitioner Leslie Rutledge, Attorney General of Arkansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas, Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72223

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
5016826302
Party name: Leslie Rutledge
Attorneys for Respondent
M. Miller Baker
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street
Washington, DC 20001

mbaker@mwe.com
202-756-8000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Dean RichlinFoley Hoag LLP
155 Seaport Blvd.
Boston, MA 02210

drichlin@foleyhoag.com
617-832-1140
Party name: Pharmaceutical Care Management Association
Other
Karli Ann Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

karli.eisenberg@doj.ca.gov
9162107913
Party name: States of California, et al.