No. 18-530
Title:Congregation Jeshuat Israel, Petitioner
v.
Congregation Shearith Israel
Docketed:October 24, 2018
Linked with 18A174
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1756)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2018Application (18A174) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 5, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 20 2018Application (18A174) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until October 22, 2018.
Oct 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2018Waiver of right of respondent Congregation Shearith Israel to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Brief amicus curiae of State of Rhode Island filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Simon Wiesenthal Center filed.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 04 2018Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2019)
Dec 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2019 to February 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 4, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gary Philip Naftalis
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gnaftalis@KRAMERLEVIN.com
212-715-9253
Party name: Congregation Jeshuat Israel
Attorneys for Respondent
Louis M. Solomon
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
599 Lexington Ave
New York, NY 10022

lsolomon@reedsmith.com
212-549-0400
Party name: Congregation Shearith Israel
Other
Michael W. Field
    Counsel of Record
Department of Attorney General
150 South Main Street
Providence, RI 02903

mfield@riag.ri.gov
401-274-4400
Party name: State of Rhode Island Attorney Gneral
Martin Mendelsohn
    Counsel of Record
Mendelsohn Consultancy
5705 McKinley Street
Bethesda, MD 20817

martin@mendelsohnconsultancy.com
3018975765
Party name: Simon Wiesenthal Center