No. 18-528
Title:Elias Kifle, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jemal Ahmed
Docketed:October 23, 2018
Linked with 18A169
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17008)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 25, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 13 2018Application (18A169) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 23, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Aug 16 2018Application (18A169) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 22, 2018.
Oct 22 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 23, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2018Brief of respondent Jemal Ahmed in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 06 2018Reply of petitioners Elias Kifle, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noah Carey Graubart Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson P.C.
1180 Peachtree Street, NE, 21st Floor
Atlanta, GA 30309

graubart@fr.com
404-892-5005
Party name: Elias Kifle, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mary Elizabeth Gately
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
500 Eighth Street NW
Washington, DC 20004

mary.gately@dlapiper.com
202-799-4507
Party name: Jemal Ahmed