No. 18-525
Title:Fort Bend County, Texas, Petitioner
v.
Lois M. Davis
Docketed:October 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-20640)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 20, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2018 to December 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2018.
Dec 19 2018Brief of respondent Lois Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2018Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Dec 26 2018Reply of petitioner Fort Bend County filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jan 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Lois Davis.
Blanket Consent
Feb 04 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Fort Bend County.
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 22, 2019
Feb 25 2019Brief of petitioner Fort Bend County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Scott Dodson in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Center for Workplace Compliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Colleen Elizabeth Roh Sinzdak
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells LLP
555 13th Street NW
Washington, DC 20004

colleen.sinzdak@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5600
Party name: Fort Bend County
Neal Kumar KatyalHogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Fort Bend County
Attorneys for Respondent
Raffi Melkonian
    Counsel of Record
Wright, Close & Barger LLP
1 Riverway, Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

melkonian@wrightclose.com
713-572-4321
Party name: Lois Davis
Other
Scott William Dodson
    Counsel of Record
UC Hastings College of the Law
Professor of Law
200 McAlister Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

dodson@alumni.duke.edu
925-285-1445
Party name: Scott Dodson
Collin O'Connor Udell
    Counsel of Record
Jackson Lewis P.C.
90 State House Square, 8th Floor
Hartford, CT 06103-3708

collin.udell@jacksonlewis.com
8605220404
Party name: NATIONAL CONFERENCE OF STATE LEGISLATURES, et al.
Rae Thiesfield Vann
    Counsel of Record
NT Lakis, LLP
1501 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

rvann@ntlakis.com
2026295600
Party name: Center for Workplace Compliance, NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, and National Retail Federation