No. 18-505
Title:In Re United States, et al., Petitioners
Docketed:October 18, 2018
Linked with 18A410
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 18 2018Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due November 19, 2018)
PetitionProof of Service
Oct 18 2018Application (18A410) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicants, IT IS ORDERED that discovery and trial in the United States District Court for the District of Oregon, in case No. 6:15-cv-01517, are stayed pending receipt of a response, due on or before Wednesday, October 24, 2018, by 3 p.m., and further order of The Chief Justice or of the Court.
Oct 22 2018Response to application from respondents Juliana, Kelsey C. R., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 24 2018Reply of applicants United States, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceReply
Nov 02 2018Application (18A410) referred to the Court.
Nov 02 2018Application (18A410) denied without prejudice by the Court. The order heretofore entered by The Chief Justice is vacated. (See order for additional language.) Justice Thomas and Justice Gorsuch would grant the application.
Nov 19 2018Brief of respondents Kelsey J., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2018Letter of November 23, 2018, from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Julia Ann Olson
    Counsel of Record
Wild Earth Advocates
1216 Lincoln Street
Eugene, OR 97401

juliaaolson@gmail.com
415 786 4825
Party name: Kelsey J., et al.