No. 18-500
Title:The First Presbyterian Church U. S. A. of Tulsa, Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Doe
Docketed:October 18, 2018
Linked with 18A188
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(115, 182)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 4, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 20 2018Application (18A188) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 2, 2018 to October 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Application (18A188) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 4, 2018.
Oct 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2018 to December 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, First Presbyterian Church U.S.A. of Tulsa, Oklahoma, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Oklahoma Wesleyan University filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 19 2018Brief amici curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 19 2018Brief amicus curiae of Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Brief of respondent John Doe in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 02 2019Reply of petitioners First Presbyterian Church U.S.A. of Tulsa, Oklahoma, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: First Presbyterian Church U.S.A. of Tulsa, Oklahoma, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: John Doe
Other
Thomas Henderson Dupree Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

tdupree@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty and Stewards Ministries
Mark David Spencer
    Counsel of Record
McAfee & Taft
10th Fl., Two Leadership Sq.
211 N. Robinson
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

mark.spencer@mcafeetaft.com
(405) 235-9621
Party name: Oklahoma Wesleyan University
Herbert William Titus
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave W
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

htitus@cox.net
7033565070
Party name: Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund