No. 18-50 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Linda Carty, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:July 9, 2018
Linked with 17A1193
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-61,055-02)
   Decision Date:February 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 27 2018Application (17A1193) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2018 to June 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Application (17A1193) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 7, 2018.
May 21 2018Application (17A1193) to extend further the time from June 7, 2018 to July 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 24 2018Application (17A1193) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 9, 2018.
Jul 09 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, State of Texas
Blanket Consent
Jul 20 2018Blanket Consent received from counsel of record for Petitioner, Linda Carty filed.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Motion of State of Texas for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (July 30, 2018 - to be resubmitted)
Jul 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 7, 2018.
Aug 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of The United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland as Amicus Curiae in Support of Petitioner Petitioner Linda Anita Carty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Texas Criminal Justice Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 7, 2018 to October 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 9, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
7132291855
Party name: Linda Carty
Attorneys for Respondent
Katherine Diane HayesAttorney General of Texas
PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711

katherine.hayes@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1400
Party name: State of Texas
Other
Katherine Anne Hollingsworth Dyson
    Counsel of Record
White & Case
75 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

kate.dyson@whitecase.com
617-979-9330
Party name: Texas Criminal Justice Experts
Robert K. Kry
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
600 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20037

rkry@mololamken.com
202-556-2011
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Stanley G. Schneider
    Counsel of Record
Schneider & McKinney, P.C.
440 Louisiana
Suite 800
Houston, TX 77002

stans3112@aol.com
713-951-9994
Party name: The United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland as Amicus Curiae in Support of Petitioner Petitioner Linda Anita Carty