No. 18-496
Title:Barry Michaels, Petitioner
v.
Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:October 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15279)
   Decision Date:November 3, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2018 to December 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2018.
Nov 16 2018Motion to substitute filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Amicus brief of Morton Rosenberg not accepted for filing. (November 29, 2018) (Corrected version submitted)
Nov 26 2018Response to motion to substitute from respondents filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Morton Rosenberg. (11/29/2018)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Reply in support of motion to substitute filed by petitioner.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Eliot Zapin
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Michael E. Zapin
28283 State Road 7, Suite 400
Boca Raton, FL 33498

michaelezapin@gmail.com
5618435352
Party name: Barry Michaels
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General, et al.
Other
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Morton Rosenberg