No. 18-486
Title:Toshiba Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, et al.
Docketed:October 17, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-56058)
   Decision Date:July 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Toshiba Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Oct 23 2018Waiver of right of respondent Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Ministry of Economy, Trade and Industry of Japan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2018Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2018)
Nov 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2018 to December 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 12, 2018.
Nov 30 2018Brief amici curiae of The Institute of International Bankers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Organization for International Investment filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amicus curiae of Keidanren (Japan Business Federation) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and The Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2018Brief amici curiae of EuropeanIssuers, Économiesuisse, International Chamber of Commerce Switzerland, Association Française des Entreprises Privées filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018Brief of respondents Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 21 2018Reply of petitioner Toshiba Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Christopher M. Curran
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
701 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

ccurran@whitecase.com
202 626 3643
Party name: Toshiba Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents
Susan K. Alexander
    Counsel of Record
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd, LLP
One Montgomery Street
Suite 1800
San Francisco, CA 94104

salexander@rgrdlaw.com
4152884545
Party name: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, et al.
Other
Donald I Baker
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Miller PLLC
2401 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 300
Washington, DC 20037

dbaker@bakerandmiller.com
202-663-7820
Party name: Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland
George Thomas Conway III
    Counsel of Record
Watchell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

gtconway@wlrk.com
(212) 403-1000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Roger Allen Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
1 Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

racooper@cgsh.com
212-225-2283
Party name: EuropeanIssuers, Économiesuisse, International Chamber of Commerce Switzerland, Association Française des Entreprises Privées
Jared Lee Hubbard
    Counsel of Record
Fitch Law Partners LLP
One Beacon Street
Boston, MA 02108

jlh@fitchlp.com
6175425542
Party name: Keidanren (Japan Business Federation)
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: The Institute of International Bankers, The Swiss Bankers Association
Lewis Jeffrey Liman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

lliman@cgsh.com
2122252550
Party name: The Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and The Competitive Enterprise Institute
David Mullaney Rice
    Counsel of Record
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
275 Battery Street
Suite 2600
San Francisco, CA 94111

david.rice@squirepb.com
415-954-0200
Party name: The Organization for International Investment
Kenneth S. Ulrich
    Counsel of Record
Goldberg Kohn Bell Black Rosenbloom & Mortiz
55 East Monroe Street
Suite 3300
Chicago, IL 60603

kenneth.ulrich@goldbergkohn.com
(312) 201-3934
Party name: The Ministry of Economy, Trade and Industry of Japan