No. 18-485
Title:Edward G. McDonough, Petitioner
v.
Youel Smith, Individually and as Special District Attorney for the County of Rensselaer, New York, aka Trey Smith
Docketed:October 16, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-296)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2018.
Nov 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Criminal Defense Organizations, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Dec 07 2018Brief of respondent Youel Smith in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 18 2018Reply of petitioner Edward G. McDonough filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Edward G. McDonough
Attorneys for Respondent
Thomas James O'Connor
    Counsel of Record
Napierski, VanDenburgh, Napierski & O'Connor, LLP
296 Washington Avenue Extension, Suite 3
Albany, NY 12203

toc@nvnolaw.com
5188629292
Party name: Youel Smith
Other
Robert Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

stanton.jones@apks.com
202-942-5855
Party name: Criminal Defense Organizations, Civil Rights Organizations, and the Cato Institute
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
202-499-4232
Party name: Cause of Action Institute
Ronald S. Sullivan Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School
6 Everett Street, Suite 516
Cambridge, MA 02138

rsullivan@law.harvard.edu
617-496-8143
Party name: Criminal Justice Institute of Harvard Law School