No. 18-481
Title:Food Marketing Institute, Petitioner
v.
Argus Leader Media, dba Argus Leader
Docketed:October 15, 2018
Linked with 18A146
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1346)
   Decision Date:May 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:July 13, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2018Application (18A146) to recall and stay mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 09 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, case No. 17-1346, is hereby recalled and stayed pending further order of the undersigned or of the Court. It is further ordered that a response to the application be filed on or before Thursday, August 16, 2018, by 4 p.m. The reply, if any, is to be filed by 4 p.m., Tuesday, August 21, 2018.
Aug 16 2018Response to application from respondent Argus Leader Media, D/B/A Argus Leader filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Reply of applicant Food Marketing Institute filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Aug 29 2018Application (18A146) referred to the Court.
Aug 29 2018Application (18A146) granted by the Court. The application to recall and stay the mandate, presented to Justice Gorsuch and by him referred to the Court, is granted, and the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit in case No. 17-1346 is recalled and stayed pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Justice Ginsburg, Justice Sotomayor, and Justice Kagan would deny the application.
Oct 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2018 to December 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 14, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Alliance of Marine Mammal Parks & Aquariums, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association of Convenience Stores, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 20 2018Consent to change of Respondent's counsel of record of Argus Leader Media, d/b/a Argus Leader not accepted for filing. (November 27, 2018 -- Document not of the type that is to be filed electronically)
Dec 14 2018Brief of respondent Argus Leader Media, d/b/a Argus Leader in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 24 2018Reply of petitioner Food Marketing Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jan 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Argus Leader Media, d/b/a Argus Leader.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 31 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Food Marketing Institute.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 22, 2019
Feb 15 2019Brief of petitioner Food Marketing Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2019Joint appendix filed (2 vols).
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Brief amici curiae of National Association of Convenience Stores, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Alliance of Marine Mammal Parks & Aquariums, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2019Brief of respondent Argus Leader Media, d/b/a Argus Leader filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Mar 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Cause of Action Institute, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of New Hampshire Right to Life filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, Center for Science in the Public Interest, Collaboration for Research Integrity filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Freedom of Information Act and First Amendment Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press & 36 Media Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Detention Watch Network, Human Rights Defense Center and Prison Policy Initiative filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Affidavit of Service of BioScience Advisors, Inc. not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted).
Mar 25 2019Corrected Affidavit of Service filed with respect to amicus curiae brief of BioScience Advisors, Inc. (March29, 2019).
Main Document
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of BioScience Advisors, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2019Brief amici curiae of AI Now Institute at New York University, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Small Business League filed. (To be Reprinted) (Distributed)
Mar 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Small Business League filed. (April 16, 2019) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. Dist. of South Dakota Southern Division. (1 Box).
Apr 01 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 05 2019Reply of petitioner Food Marketing Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Argued. For petitioner: Evan A. Young, Austin, Tex.; and Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae). For respondent: Robert M. Loeb, Washington, D. C.
Jun 24 2019Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Alito, Kagan, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Breyer, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Ginsburg and Sotomayor, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gavin Robert Villareal
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701

gavin.villareal@bakerbotts.com
512-322-2652
Party name: Food Marketing Institute
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Mark Loeb
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

rloeb@orrick.com
202-339-8475
Party name: Argus Leader Media, d/b/a Argus Leader
Jon Elmer ArnesonJon E. Arneson
123 S. Main Avenue
Sioux Falls, SD 57104

jea44@aol.com
605-335-0083
Party name: Argus Leader Media, d/b/a Argus Leader
Other
Shannen Wayne Coffin
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20036

scoffin@steptoe.com
202-429-3000
Party name: National Association of Convenience Stores, et al.
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
202-639-6500
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Ira T. Kasdan
    Counsel of Record
Kelley Drye& Warren LLP
3050 K Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20007

ikasdan@kelleydrye.com
202-342-8400
Party name: Alliance of Marine Mammal Parks & Aquariums, et al.
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
1156 15th St. NW Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
202.795.9300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press & 36 Media Organizations
Robert Stokes Clark
    Counsel of Record
Parr Brown Gee & Loveless
101 South 200 East
Suite 700
Salt Lake City, UT 84111-0000

rclark@parrbrown.com
801-532-7840
Party name: BioScience Advisors, Inc.
Michael C. Dorf
    Counsel of Record
Cornell University Law School
304 Myron Taylor Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

michaeldorf@cornell.edu
607-255-3890
Party name: Freedom of Information Act and First Amendment Scholars
Lucinda Margaret Finley
    Counsel of Record
University at Buffalo Law School
513 O'Brian Hall
Buffalo, NY 14260

finleylu@buffalo.edu
7168034202
Party name: AI Now Institute at New York University, et al.
Ryan Patrick Mulvey
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

ryan.mulvey@causeofaction.org
(202) 499-4232
Party name: Cause of Action Institute, et al.
Karl Olson
    Counsel of Record
Cannata, O'Toole, Fickes & Olson LLP
100 Pine Street
Suite 350
San Francisco, CA 94111

kolson@cofolaw.com
415-409-8900
Party name: American Small Business League
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-483-1140
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center
Ghita R. Schwarz
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Rights
666 Broadway, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10012

gschwarz@ccrjustice.org
212-614-6464
Party name: Detention Watch Network, Human Rights Defense and Prison Policy Initiative
Michael J. Tierney
    Counsel of Record
Wadleigh, Starr & Peters, PLLC
95 Market Street
Manchester, NH 03101

mtierney@wadleighlaw.com
603-669-4140
Party name: New Hampshire Right to Life
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

azieve@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, et al.