No. 18-472
Title:Behr Dayton Thermal Products LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Terry Martin, et al.
Docketed:October 12, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3663)
   Decision Date:July 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 20, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Behr Dayton Thermal Products LLC, et al..
Blanket Consent
Nov 13 2018Waiver of right of respondents Terry Martin, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 13 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Nov 29 2018Response Requested. (Due January 2, 2019)
Dec 11 2018Motion of Terry Martin, et al. for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Behr Dayton Thermal Products LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ned Miltenberg
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Ned Miltenberg
Law Offices of Ned Miltenberg
5410 Mohican Rd
Bethesda, MD 20816

nedmiltenberg@gmail.com
2026564490
Party name: Terry Martin, et al.
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Tort Reform Association, and National Association of Manufacturers