No. 18-459
Title:Emulex Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Gary Varjabedian, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55088)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:September 6, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2018 to November 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 30, 2018.
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondents Gary Varjabedian, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Emulex Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Geyser P.C.
One Energy Square
4925 Greenville Ave., Ste. 200
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@geyserpc.com
214-800-2660
Party name: Gary Varjabedian, et al.
Other
George Thomas Conway III
    Counsel of Record
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

gtconway@wlrk.com
(212) 403-1230
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Marc J. Gottridge
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

marc.gottridge@hoganlovells.com
212-918-3000
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association