No. 18-453
Title:Olivia de Havilland, Petitioner
v.
FX Networks, LLC, et al.
Docketed:October 11, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B285629)
   Decision Date:March 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:July 11, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2018Brief of respondents FX Networks, LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Reply of petitioner Olivia de Havilland filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Suzelle M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Howarth and Smith
523 W. 6th Street
Suite 728
Los Angeles, CA 90014

ssmith@howarth-smith.com
213-955-9400
Party name: Olivia de Havilland
Attorneys for Respondents
Kelly M. Klaus
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kelly.Klaus@mto.com
213-683-9100
Party name: FX Networks, LLC, et al.