No. 18-447
Vide 18-612
Title:Alabama Department of Revenue, et al., Petitioners
v.
CSX Transportation, Inc.
Docketed:October 10, 2018
Linked with 18A235
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-11705)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 31, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2018Application (18A235) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2018 to October 8, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Application (18A235) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 8, 2018.
Oct 05 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2018 to December 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2018.
Nov 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of Multistate Tax Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2018Brief of respondent CSX Transportation, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2018Reply of petitioner Alabama Department of Revenue, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven Troy Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

mnewman@ago.state.al.us
3342427300
Party name: Alabama Department of Revenue, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Stephen Dorr Goodwin
    Counsel of Record
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz
165 Madison Avenue
Suite 2000
Memphis, TN 38103

sgoodwin@bakerdonelson.com
901.577.2141
Party name: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Other
Helen Hecht
    Counsel of Record
Multistate Tax Commission, 444 North Capitol Street
Washington, DC 20001

hhecht@mtc.gov
202-650-0300
Party name: Multistate Tax Commission