No. 18-431
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Maurice Lamont Davis and Andre Levon Glover
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-10330)
   Decision Date:September 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Oct 16 2018Letter of October 16, 2018 from the Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
Oct 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondent Andre Levon Glover in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondent Maurice Lamont Davis in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andre Levon Glover.
Main Document
Dec 03 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Maurice Lamont Davis.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Brandon Elliott Beck
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office, Northern District of Texas
1205 Texas Ave. #507
Lubbock, TX 79401

brandonebeck@gmail.com
806-472-7236
Party name: Maurice Lamont Davis, et al.
J. Joseph Mongaras Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Udashen Anton
2311 Cedar Springs, Suite 250
Dallas, TX 75201

jjm@udashenanton.com
214-468-8100
Party name: Andre Levon Glover