No. 18-428
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Clifford Raymond Salas
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Linked with 18A152
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2170)
   Decision Date:May 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 23, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2018Application (18A152) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2018 to September 20, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 10 2018Application (18A152) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 20, 2018.
Sep 06 2018Application (18A152) to extend further the time from September 20, 2018 to October 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Sep 07 2018Application (18A152) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 19, 2018.
Oct 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 2, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 3, 2018 to December 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including December 6, 2018.
Dec 07 2018Motion of Clifford Raymond Salas for leave to proceed in forma pauperis submitted.
Main Document
Dec 07 2018Brief of Clifford Raymond Salas in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Howard A. Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Fed Pub. Def. for Dist. CO &WY
633 17th Street
Suite 1000
Denver, CO 80202

howard_pincus@fd.org
303-294-7002
Party name: Clifford Raymond Salas