No. 18-422
Title:Robert A. Rucho, et al., Appellants
v.
Common Cause, et al.
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:16-CV-1026)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Common Cause, et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Robert A. Rucho, et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 31 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of Philip P. Kalodner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Motion to affirm filed by appellees Common Cause, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Nov 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al..
Blanket Consent
Nov 08 2018Supplemental brief of appellees Common Cause, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Nov 20 2018Brief opposing motion to affirm from appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 04 2019Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. The case will be set for argument in the March argument session.
Jan 08 2019Appellants' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Friday, February 8, 2019. Appellees' briefs on the merits are to be filed on or before Monday, March 4, 2019. Reply briefs on the merits are to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellants or in support of neither party are to be filed on or before Tuesday, February 12, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs in support of appellees are to be filed on or before Friday, March 8, 2019.
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
Jan 30 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Robert A. Rucho, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Common Cause, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Blanket Consent
Feb 05 2019Joint motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by appellees.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 08 2019Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Feb 08 2019Brief of appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of David Orentlicher in support of neither party filed (also in 18-726).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Republican Redistricting Trust filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of the American Civil Rights Union and Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation in support of neither party filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of The Republican National Committee and the National Republican Congressional Committee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress from the North Carolina Delegation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Texas House Representative Carl Isett filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Speaker Michael C. Turzai filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie in support of neither party filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amici curiae of The Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 15 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Middle Dist. of North Carolina.
Mar 04 2019Brief of appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. filed. (Reprinted version submitted)
Mar 04 2019Brief of appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al. filed. (March 5, 2019) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2019Brief of appellees Common Cause, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Colleagues of Professor Norman Dorsen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Clinic Duke Law School filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2019Brief amicus curiae of Eric S. Lander filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Stephen M. Shapiro filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor D. Theodore Rave filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of First Amendment and Election Law Scholars filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Amicus brief of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression not accepted for filing. (March 11, 2019)
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Wesley Pegden, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Group of Current and Former Members of the House of Representatives filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Christopher S. Elmendorf, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (also in 18-726) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Senator Sheldon Whitehouse filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of States of Oregon, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of 27 Election Law, Scientific Evidence, and Empirical Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of the American Jewish Committee filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Political Science Professors filed (also in18-726).
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Governors Arnold Schwarzenegger and Lawrence Joseph Hogan, Jr. filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Democracy North Carolina and The People's Alliance Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of the American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., et al. filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Historians filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Anti-Defamation League, et al. filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael Kang filed (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Amicus brief of Mathematicians, Law Professors, and Students submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2019Amicus brief of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression not accepted for filing. (Corrected brief submitted).
Mar 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression filed (March 18, 2019) (also in 18-726). (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 15 2019Joint motion of appellees for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument GRANTED in part, and the time is divided as follows: 35 minutes for appellants, 20 minutes for appellees Common Cause, et al., and 15 minutes for appellees League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Mar 19 2019Reply of appellants Robert A. Rucho, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Robert A. Rucho, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-881-4100
Party name: Common Cause, et al.
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: League of Women Voters of North Carolina, et al.
Other
Jonathan M. Greenbaum
    Counsel of Record
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1500 K Street, NW
9th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

jgreenbaum@lawyerscommittee.org
202-662-8315
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Philip P. Kalodner
    Counsel of Record
Philip P Kalodner
208 Righters Mill Rd
208 Righters Mill Rd
Gladwyne, PA 19035

pkalodner@aol.com
610-649-8749
Party name: Philip P Kalodner
Jonathan K. Youngwood
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

JYoungwood@STBLAW.com
2124552000
Party name: Democracy North Carolina and The People's Alliance Fund
Floyd Abrams
    Counsel of Record
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
80 Pine Street
New York, NY 10005

fabrams@cahill.com
212-701-3621
Party name: Floyd Abrams Institute for Freedom of Expression
Efrem M. Braden
    Counsel of Record
Baker &Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1500
Party name: Speaker Michael C. Turzai
Adriel I. Cepeda Derieux
    Counsel of Record
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

ACepedaDerieux@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, NEW YORK CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, ACLU OF NORTH CAROLINA, AND ACLU OF MARYLAND,
Douglas Andrew Chin
    Counsel of Record
University of North Carolina School of Law
160 Ridge Road, CB #3380
Chapel Hill, NC 27599-3380

chin@unc.edu
919-962-4116
Party name: ELECTION LAW, SCIENTIFIC EVIDENCE, AND EMPIRICAL LEGAL SCHOLARS
Richard Wayland Clary
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

rclary@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: Historians
Tacy Fletcher Flint
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

tflint@sidley.com
312-853-7000
Party name: Professors Wesley Pegden, Jonathan Rodden, and Samuel S.-H. Wang
Michael Robert Geroe
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Michael R. Geroe
P.O. Box 235211
Encinitas, CA 92023-5211

mgeroe@gmail.com
7606525548
Party name: Stephen M. Shapiro
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Edward Dean Greim
    Counsel of Record
Graves Garrett LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2700
Kansas City, MO 64105

edgreim@gravesgarrett.com
816-256-4144
Party name: The National Republican Redistricting Trust
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Mathematicians, Law Professors, and Students
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
State of Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court Street NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
503-378-4402
Party name: States of Oregon, et al.
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and Utah
David Edward Leit
    Counsel of Record
Lowenstein Sandler, LLP
One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07068

dleit@lowenstein.com
9735972340
Party name: Anti-Defamation League, et al.
Justin Michael Levitt
    Counsel of Record
Loyola Law School
919 Albany Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015

justin.levitt@lls.edu
213-736-7417
Party name: NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar and Scott LLP
54 W. Hubbard Street
Chicago, IL 60654

adam.mortara@bartlit-beck.com
7737507154
Party name: The Wisconsin State Senate and Wisconsin State Assembly
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Senator Sheldon Whitehouse
Burt Neuborne
    Counsel of Record
Burt Neuborne
40 Washington Square South
New York, NY 10012

burt.neuborne@nyu.edu
(212) 998-6172
Party name: BRIEF OF COLLEAGUES OF PROFESSOR NORMAN DORSEN
Joseph M. Nixon
    Counsel of Record
The Nixon Law Firm P.C.
6363 Woodway
suite 800
Houston, TX 77057

joe@nixonlawtx.com
713-55-7535
Party name: Honorable Carl Isset
David Orentlicher
    Counsel of Record
UNLV William S. Boyd School of Law
4505 S. Maryland Parkway
Box 451003
Las Vegas, NV 89154-1003

dorentli@gmail.com
702-895-2333
Party name: David Orentlicher
Mark Alexander Packman
    Counsel of Record
Gilbert LLP
1100 New York Avenue NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005

packmanm@gilbertlegal.com
202-772-2320
Party name: Professors Christopher S. Elmendorf, Joseph Fishkin, Bertrall Ross, Douglas Spencer, and Franita Tolson
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
616-B Green Street
Gainesville, GA 30501

jjp@jackparklaw.com
470-892-6444
Party name: American Civil Rights Union and Southeastern Legal Foundation
Gary Michael Parsons Jr.
    Counsel of Record
245 Sullivan Street
New York, NY 10012

michael.parsons@nyu.edu
212-992-8196
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Bradley S. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP
350 South Grand Avenue
50th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

brad.phillips@mto.com
213-683-9100
Party name: FIRST AMENDMENT AND ELECTION LAW SCHOLARS
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and AEF
H. Jefferson Powell
    Counsel of Record
Duke Law School
210 Science Drive
Durham, NC 27708-0360

jefferson.powell01@gmail.com
9196137168
Party name: First Amendment Clinic Duke Law School
Donald Theodore Rave III
    Counsel of Record
University of Houston Law Center
2402 Calhoun Rd.
Room 142 BLB
Houston, TX 77204

teddy.rave@gmail.com
713-743-2499
Party name: Professor D. Theodore Rave
Richard A. Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

rrosen@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: THE AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Bernard Grofman and Ronald Keith Gaddie
James Paul Rouhandeh
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk and Wardwell
450 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10017

james.rouhandeh@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Professor Michael Kang
David Abba Schwarz
    Counsel of Record
Irell & Manella LLP
1800 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 900
Los Angeles, CA 90067

dschwarz@irell.com
310-277-1010
Party name: GOVERNORS ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER AND LAWRENCE JOSEPH HOGAN JR.
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
4156594843
Party name: Political Science Professors Allison P. Harris, et al.
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: The Republican National Committee and the National Republican Congressional Committee
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
312-759-5947
Party name: Members of Congress from the North Carolina Delegation
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Bipartisan Group of Current and Former Members of the House of Representatives
H. Reed Witherby
    Counsel of Record
Smith Duggan Buell & Rufo, LLP
101 Federal Street, Suite 1405
Boston, MA 02110-1817

rwitherby@smithduggan.com
617.216.6930
Party name: Eric S. Lander