No. 18-420
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Gerald Adrian Wheeler
Docketed:October 4, 2018
Linked with 18A224
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-6073)
   Decision Date:March 28, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:June 11, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2018Application (18A224) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 9, 2018.
Aug 29 2018Application (18A224) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 9, 2018 to October 9, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word Count
Nov 05 2018Waiver of right of respondent Gerald Adrian Wheeler to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 13 2018Response Requested. (Due December 13, 2018)
Nov 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 14, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Attorneys for Respondent
Joshua Brown Carpenter
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender, NCWD
1 Page Ave., Suite 210
Asheville, NC 28801

joshua_carpenter@fd.org
828-232-9992
Party name: Gerald Adrian Wheeler