No. 18-42
Title:GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:July 9, 2018
Linked with 17A1096
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1124, 16-3019)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:February 7, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 05 2018Application (17A1096) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 8, 2018 to July 7, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 11 2018Application (17A1096) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 6, 2018.
Jul 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 8, 2018 to October 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 9, 2018.
Aug 08 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Tort Reform Association.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 08 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

lisa.blatt@arnoldporter.com
202-679-5257
Party name: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 94005
Baton Rouge, LA 70084-9005

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: State of Louisiana
Other
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
Cary Silverman
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy and Bacon LLP
1155 F Street NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20004

csilverman@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: American Tort Reform Association