No. 18-415
Title:HP Inc., fka Hewlett-Packard Company, Petitioner
v.
Steven E. Berkheimer
Docketed:October 3, 2018
Linked with 18A88
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1437)
   Decision Date:February 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 31, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2018Application (18A88) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 29, 2018 to September 28, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Application (18A88) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 28, 2018.
Sep 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Oct 08 2018Waiver of right of respondent Steven E. Berkheimer to respond filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 15 2018Response Requested. (Due November 14, 2018)
Oct 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, HP Inc., f/k/a Hewlett-Packard Company.
Blanket Consent
Oct 22 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Steven E. Berkheimer.
Blanket Consent
Oct 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and R Street Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of T-Mobile USA, Inc., and Sprint Spectrum L.P. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amicus curiae of Askeladden LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2018Brief amici curiae of Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. and CableLabs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018Brief of respondent Steven E. Berkheimer in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
2027393000
Party name: HP Inc., f/k/a Hewlett-Packard Company
Attorneys for Respondent
James Philip Hanrath
    Counsel of Record
Much Shelist P.C.
191 North Wacker Drive, Suite 1800
Chicago, IL 60606

jhanrath@muchlaw.com
312.521.2000
Party name: Steven E. Berkheimer
Other
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8400
Party name: Check Point Software Technologies, Inc. and CableLabs
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
Gateway Plaza
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
(804)775-4716
Party name: T-Mobile USA, Inc., and Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Joshua Stephen Landau
    Counsel of Record
Computer and Communications Industry Association
655 15th St NW Suite #410
Washington, DC 20005

jlandau@ccianet.org
202-783-0070
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Engine Advocacy
Alexandra Helen Moss
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

alex@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and R Street Institute
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: Askeladden LLC