No. 18-410
Vide 18-6336
Title:Corey D. Yates, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 2, 2018
Linked with 18A138
Lower Ct:District of Columbia Court of Appeals
   Case Numbers:(12-CF-1985)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 18, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 03 2018Application (18A138) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2018 to October 1, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 06 2018Application (18A138) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 1, 2018.
Oct 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Nov 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 3, 2018 to January 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 2, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Catherine Mary Agnes Carroll
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

catherine.carroll@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6072
Party name: Corey Yates
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States