No. 18-391
Title:Arizona, Petitioner
v.
Guy James Goodman
Docketed:September 27, 2018
Linked with 18A147
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-17-0221-PR)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2018Application (18A147) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 23, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Application (18A147) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 24, 2018.
Sep 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Oct 22 2018Waiver of right of respondent Guy James Goodman to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 29 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc., et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Michael C. Dorf, et al. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2018Amicus brief of The States of Texas, et al. not accepted for filing. (November 01, 2018) (Corrected version submitted)
Oct 29 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed) (Amended version submitted October 30, 2018)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 06 2018Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2018)
Nov 15 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2018 to January 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2018Letter response to respondent's request for extension filed.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 19, 2018.
Nov 16 2018Letter reply in support of request for extension filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
2005 North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
6025423333
Party name: Arizona
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholaus Anthony Podsiadlik
    Counsel of Record
Maricopa County Public Defender
620 W. Jackson St., Suite 4015
Phoenix, AZ 85003

podsiadlikn@mail.maricopa.gov
6025067711
Party name: Guy James Goodman
Other
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: THE STATES OF TEXAS, NEBRASKA, ARKANSAS, COLORADO, GEORGIA, LOUISIANA, AND NEW MEXICO
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3100
Party name: Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc., Memory of Victims Everywhere to Rescue Justice, and National Crime Victim Law Institute
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219

elin@hunton.com
804-788-8200
Party name: Michael C. Dorf and Kevin C. Walsh