No. 18-39
Title:Jason Lee Boyd, Petitioner
v.
Washington
Docketed:July 6, 2018
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Washington, Division 1
   Case Numbers:(74933-1-I)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 4, 2018
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 6, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent Washington to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 30 2018Response Requested. (Due October 1, 2018)
Sep 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 1, 2018 to October 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 22, 2018.
Oct 22 2018Brief of respondent State of Washington in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Reply of petitioner Jason Lee Boyd filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lila J. Silverstein
    Counsel of Record
Washington Appellate Project
1511 Third Avenue
Suite 610
Seattle, WA 98101

lila@washapp.org
206-587-2711
Party name: Jason Lee Boyd
Attorneys for Respondent
Arne Orlando Denny
    Counsel of Record
Skagit County Prosecutor's Office
605 South Third Street
Mount Vernon, WA 98273

arned@co.skagit.wa.us
(360) 416-1600
Party name: State of Washington
Erik Pedersen
    Counsel of Record
Skagit County Prosecutor's Office
605 South Third Street
Mount Vernon, WA 98274

skagitappeals@co.skagit.wa.us
360-416-1600
Party name: Washington