No. 18-389
Title:Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Brian Newton
Docketed:September 26, 2018
Linked with 18A20
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-56352)
   Decision Date:February 5, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 27, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2018Application (18A20) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 26, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 05 2018Application (18A20) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 27, 2018.
Aug 07 2018Application (18A20) to extend further the time from August 27, 2018 to September 24, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 08 2018Application (18A20) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 24, 2018.
Sep 24 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd.
Blanket Consent
Oct 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 26, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 26, 2018.
Oct 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief of respondent Brian Newton in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Reply of petitioner Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 11 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jan 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Brian Newton
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 23 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd..
Blanket Consent
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 16, 2019
Feb 20 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main Document
Feb 20 2019Brief of petitioner Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2019Brief amici curiae of Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 22 2019Brief of respondent Brian Newton filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 29 2019Brief amicus curiae of California Applicants' Attorneys Association ("CAAA") filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2019Reply of petitioner Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 12 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 16 2019Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C.; and Christopher G. Michel, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Parker Drilling Management Services, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondent
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Brian Newton
Michael Anthony StraussStrauss & Strauss, APC
121 N. Fir St., Ste F
Ventura, CA 93001

mike@strausslawyers.com
8056416600
Party name: Brian Newton
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
202-868-6915
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6500
Party name: Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, et al.
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW APPELLATE ADVOCACY CLINIC
Post Office Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: CALIFORNIA APPLICANTS’ ATTORNEYS ASSOCIATION (“CAAA”)