No. 18-374
Title:Wuilson Estuardo Lemus Castillo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 21, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-10830)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2018 to November 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 21, 2018.
Nov 21 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 03 2018Reply of petitioner Wuilson Estuardo Lemus Castillo filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Wuilson Estuardo Lemus Castillo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States