No. 18-370
Title:Marlon Haight, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3123 ,17-3002)
   Decision Date:June 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 11 2018Response Requested. (Due November 13, 2018)
Nov 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2018 to December 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 13, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Marlon Haight
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States