No. 18-365
Vide 18-364
Title:The Presbyterian Church in Morristown, et al., Petitioners
v.
Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al.
Docketed:September 20, 2018
Linked with 18A137
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Jersey
   Case Numbers:(079277)
   Decision Date:April 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 31 2018Application (18A137) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2018 to September 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 06 2018Application (18A137) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 18, 2018.
Sep 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 26, 2018.
Nov 26 2018Brief of respondents Freedom from Religion Foundation, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2018Reply of THE PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH IN MORRISTOWN, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kenneth John Wilbur
    Counsel of Record
Drinker Biddle, et al.
600 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932

ken.wilbur@dbr.com
973-549-7320
Party name: THE PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH IN MORRISTOWN, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Freedom from Religion Foundation, et al.