No. 18-364
Vide 18-365
Title:Morris County Board of Chosen Freeholders, et al., Petitioners
v.
Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al.
Docketed:September 20, 2018
Linked with 18A105
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of New Jersey
   Case Numbers:(079277)
   Decision Date:April 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 21, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 27 2018Application (18A105) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 19, 2018 to September 19, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 31 2018Application (18A105) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 18, 2018.
Sep 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2018 to November 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 26, 2018.
Oct 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Trust for Historic Preservation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 26 2018Brief of respondents Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 10 2018Reply of petitioner Morris County Board of Chosen Freeholders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
2023497221
Party name: Morris County Board of Chosen Freeholders
Attorneys for Respondents
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Boalt Hall
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al.
Other
Thaddeus Alan Heuer
    Counsel of Record
Foley Hoag, LLP
155 Seaport Blvd
Boston, MA 02210

theuer@foleyhoag.com
617-832-1000
Party name: National Trust for Historic Preservation
John C. Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Suite 206
516 N. Charles Street
Baltimore, MD 21201

jcmurphy1@comcast.net
410-625-4828
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association