No. 18-355
Title:Prison Legal News, Petitioner
v.
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Docketed:September 19, 2018
Linked with 18A126
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-14220)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 02 2018Application (18A126) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2018 to September 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 03 2018Application (18A126) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 14, 2018.
Sep 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 27 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Prison Legal News.
Blanket Consent
Oct 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections.
Blanket Consent
Oct 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 19, 2018 to November 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2018.
Oct 11 2018Brief amici curiae of 18 Organizations that favor freedom of the press and oppose censorship filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 15 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Corrections Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Oct 16 2018Brief amici curiae of American Friends Service Committee; et al. filed. (Corrected version submitted)
Oct 16 2018Brief amici curiae of American Friends Service Committee, et al. filed. (Amended version submitted November 1, 2018)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Civil Rights Advocacy Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Prison Book Clubs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018Brief amici curiae of Faith Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2018 to December 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 3, 2018.
Dec 03 2018Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Prison Legal News
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Other
Joseph E. Bringman
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Ave.
Suite 4800
Seattle, WA 98101

JBringman@perkinscoie.com
206-359-8501
Party name: Civil Rights Advocacy Organizations
Charles Hardy Davis
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

cdavis@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Law Professors
John Nowell Estes III
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, et al.
1440 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005-0000

john.estes@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: R Street Institute, Americans for Prosperity, The Cato Institute, Reason Foundation, and The Rutherford Institute
Bruce Edward Humble Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 2200
Seattle, WA 98101

brucejohnson@dwt.com
206-757-8069
Party name: American Friends Service Committee; Blackstone Career Institute; Center for Life Without Parole Studies; Convict PenPals; Michael P. Denea, PLC; Fast Law Publishing Associates; Great Goods; Inmate Magazine Service; Doran Larson; Millicorp; Mitzner Law Firm; Pfau Cochran Vertetis Kosnoff PLLC; Pinix & Soukup, LLC; The Law Offices of William L. Schmidt; Elaine L. Thompson, Esq.; Weidner Law, P.A.
Thomas Richard Julin
    Counsel of Record
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.
600 Brickell Avenue
Suite 3500
Miami, FL 33131-0000

tjulin@gunster.com
1-305-376-6007
Party name: Allied Daily Newspapers of Washington; Washington Newspaper Publishers Association; American Society of News Editors; Association of Alternative Newsmedia; The Authors Guild, Inc.; The Citrus County Chronicle; Criminal Justice Journalists; First Amendment Foundation, Inc.; Florida Press Association, Inc.; The Marshall Project; National Association for Rational Sexual Offense Laws; National Coalition Against Censorship; The National Press Photographers Association; New England First Amendment Coalition; Pacific Northwest Newspaper Association; The Press Freedom Defense Fund; The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press; The Joseph L. Brechner Center for Freedom of Information
Gregory M. Lipper
    Counsel of Record
Clinton Brook & Peed
1455 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20004

glipper@clintonbrook.com
(202) 996-0919
Party name: Prison Book Clubs
Brian Himanshu Pandya
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein, LLP
1776 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bpandya@wileyrein.com
(202) 719-7000
Party name: Faith Organizations
Elliott Schulder
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Wash, DC 20001

eschulder@cov.com
202-662-5462
Party name: Former Corrections Officials