No. 18-349
Title:Darrell Patterson, Petitioner
v.
Walgreen Co.
Docketed:September 17, 2018
Linked with 18A50
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16923)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 11 2018Application (18A50) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 19 2018Application (18A50) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 24, 2018.
Aug 13 2018Application (18A50) to extend further the time from August 24, 2018 to September 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 16 2018Application (18A50) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 14, 2018.
Sep 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Darrell Patterson.
Blanket Consent
Oct 08 2018Waiver of right of respondent Walgreen Co. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of Founders' First Freedom, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 17 2018Brief amici curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (COLPA), et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 17 2018Brief amicus curiae of Robert P. Roesser filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018Brief amici curiae of Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Oct 29 2018Response Requested. (Due November 28, 2018)
Nov 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 28, 2018 to January 14, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 14, 2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Duncan
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Darrell Patterson
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory Alan Hearing
    Counsel of Record
Thompson Sizemore Gonzalez & Hearing, P.A.
201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 1600
Tampa, FL 33602

ghearing@tsghlaw.com
8132730050
Party name: Walgreen Co.
Other
Bruce N. Cameron
    Counsel of Record
National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

bnc@nrtw.org
757-352-4522
Party name: Robert P. Roesser
Walter Edward Carson Sr.
    Counsel of Record
Self
16141 Ed Warfield Road
Woodbine, MD 21797

wcarson@columbiaunion.net
301-455-8114
Party name: Founders' First Freedom, Inc.
Kimberlee Wood Colby
    Counsel of Record
Christian Legal Society
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA 22151

kcolby@clsnet.org
703-894-1087
Party name: Christian Legal Society, American Islamic Congress, Association of Christian Schools International, Institutional Religious Freedom Alliance, Queens Federation of Churches
Alexander Dushku
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Key Bank Tower
36 South State St., Suite 1900
Salt Lake City, UT 94111

adushku@kmclaw.com
801-328-3600
Party name: Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; The Jewis Coalition for Religious Liberty Commission of The Southern Baptist Convention; Muslim Public Affairs Council; The Lutheran Church-Missoui Synod; The Sikh Coalition; and Church of God in Christ, Inc.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
202-828-1000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs (COLPA), et al.
Richard Shawn GunnarsonKirton McConkie
Kiront McConckie Building
50 East South Temple
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints et al.