No. 18-339
Title:June Harper, Petitioner
v.
Arthur Leahy, et al.
Docketed:September 14, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1995-cv)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 15, 2018 to November 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 14, 2018.
Oct 15 2018Brief amici curiae of The New York State Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 14, 2018 to November 30, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 30, 2018.
Nov 30 2018Brief of Arthur Leahy, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (December 04, 2018 -- Corrected version submitted)
Nov 30 2018Brief of respondents Arthur Leahy, et al. in opposition filed. (12/04/2018)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2018Reply of petitioner June Harper filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: June Harper
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: Arthur Leahy, et al.
Other
John Sievert Williams
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jwilliams@wc.com
202-434-5646
Party name: The New York State Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, Connecticut Criminal Defense Lawyers Association, District of Columbia Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, and Oklahoma Criminal Defense Lawyers Association