No. 18-328
Title:Kevin C. Rotkiske, Petitioner
v.
Paul Klemm, et al.
Docketed:September 13, 2018
Linked with 18A161
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1668)
   Decision Date:May 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2018Application (18A161) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 13, 2018 to October 12, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Aug 15 2018Application (18A161) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 12, 2018.
Sep 11 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 15, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 05 2018Response Requested. (Due December 5, 2018)
Nov 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 5, 2018 to January 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 4, 2019.
Jan 04 2019Brief of respondents Paul Klemm, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019Petition GRANTED.
Mar 08 2019Joint motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2019Joint motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 13, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 12, 2019.
Apr 03 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Kevin Rotkiske.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 22 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 13 2019Brief of petitioner Kevin Rotkiske filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2019Brief amici curiae of Samuel L. Bray, David Marcus, and Stephen C. Yeazell in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2019Amicus brief of National Consumer Law Center not accepted for filing. (May 29, 2019)(Corrected version Submitted)
May 20 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Consumer Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 16, 2019.
Jul 12 2019Brief of respondents Paul Klemm, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Receivables Management Association International, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Motion of United States for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Mortgage Bankers Association and the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of ACA International filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of The National Creditors Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 12 2019Reply of petitioner Kevin Rotkiske filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
202-237-2727
Party name: Petitioner
Matthew Benjamin WeisbergWeisberg Law
7 S. Morton Ave.
Morton, PA 19070

mweisberg@weisberglawoffices.com
6106900801
Party name: Kevin Rotkiske
Attorneys for Respondents
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
202-879-3939
Party name: Paul Klemm, et al.
Carl Edward ZapffeFenton & McGarvey Law Firm, P.S.C.
2401 Stanley Gault Parkway
Louisville, KY 40223

carlzapffe@gmail.com
502-560-6700
Party name: Paul Klemm, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Samuel L. Bray, David Marcus, and Stephen C. Yeazell
Megan Starace Ben'Ary
    Counsel of Record
LeClairRyan
2318 Mill Road, Suite 1100
Alexandria, VA 22314

megan.benary@leclairryan.com
7036475933
Party name: ACA International
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Mortgage Bankers Association and the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Donald S. Maurice Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Maurice Wutscher, LLP
5 Walter E. Foran Boulevard
Suite 2007
Flemington, NJ 08822

dmaurice@mauricewutscher.com
9082374570
Party name: Receivables Management Association International, Inc.
Stuart Todd Rossman
    Counsel of Record
7 Winthrop Square, Fourth Floor
Boston, MA 02110

srossman@nclc.org
617-542-8010
Party name: National Consumer Law Center
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Sanders LLP
One North Wacker Drive
Suite 2905
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
312-759-5947
Party name: The National Creditors Bar Association