No. 18-315
Title:Cochise Consultancy, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Linked with 17A1390
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-12836)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 19 2018Application (17A1390) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2018 to September 8, 2018, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jun 28 2018Application (17A1390) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 8, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Oct 04 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt.
Blanket Consent
Oct 11 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2018Response to petition from respondent United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 23 2018Reply of petitioners Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 16 2018Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Cochise Consultancy, Inc. and The Parsons Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Earl Neville Mayfield III
    Counsel of Record
Juris Day, PLLC
10521 Judicial Drive, Suite 200
Fairfax, VA 22030

tmayfield@jurisday.com
7032685600
Party name: United States of America ex rel. Billy Joe Hunt
Other
Jonathan Goldman Cedarbaum
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jonathan.cedarbaum@wilmerhale.com
(202) 663-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America