No. 18-309
Title:Lonnie Swartz, Petitioner
v.
Araceli Rodriguez, Individually and as the Surviving Mother and Personal Representative of J. A.
Docketed:September 11, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-16410)
   Decision Date:August 7, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2018Brief of respondent Araceli Rodriguez in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Sean Christopher Chapman
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Sean C Chapman, P.C.
100 N. Stone Avenue, Suite 701
Tucson, AZ 85701

sean@seanchapmanlaw.com
5206220747
Party name: Lonnie Swartz
Michael J. Bloom100 N. Stone Avenue
Suite 701
Tucson, AZ 85701-0000

maria@michaeljbloom.net
5208829904
Party name: Lonnie Swartz
Attorneys for Respondent
Lee Gelernt
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad St.
New York, NY 10004-2400

lgelernt@aclu.org
2125492616
Party name: Araceli Rodriguez