No. 18-307
Title:State National Bank of Big Spring. et al., Petitioners
v.
Steven T. Mnuchin, Secretary of the Treasury, et al.
Docketed:September 10, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5062)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 09 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 10, 2018 to November 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2018.
Nov 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2018 to December 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 10, 2018.
Dec 10 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 21 2018Reply of petitioners State National Bank of Big Spring, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory Frederick Jacob
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

gjacob@omm.com
(202) 383-5300
Party name: State National Bank of Big Spring, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

charlene.w.goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Oliver James Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
560 W. Crossville Rd.
Suite 104
Roswell, GA 30075-7509

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, NFIB Small Business Legal Center and Cato Institute
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
816-931-5559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Christian George Vergonis
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

cvergonis@jonesday.com
202-879-3914
Party name: The Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions