No. 18-302
Title:Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner
v.
Erik Brunetti
Docketed:September 7, 2018
Linked with 18A15
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1109)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 12, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 29 2018Application (18A15) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Application (18A15) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 10, 2018.
Jul 31 2018Application (18A15) to extend further the time from August 10, 2018 to September 7, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Written RequestProof of Service
Aug 01 2018Application (18A15) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 7, 2018.
Sep 07 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2018 to November 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2018.
Nov 08 2018Brief of respondent Erik Brunetti filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 11 2018Reply of petitioners Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 04 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 11 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 15, 2019
Feb 15 2019Brief of Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office submitted.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2019Joint Appendix submitted.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Consents for amicus brief of Kurt M. Anderson submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Andrei Iancu, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Attorneys for Respondent
John R. Sommer
    Counsel of Record
John R. Sommer, Attorney-at-Law
17426 Daimler Street
Irvine, CA 92614

sommerjohnr@gmail.com
9497525344
Party name: Erik Brunetti
Other
Kurt Michael Anderson
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15667
Minneapolis, MN 55415-0667

kurt@kmalawmn.com
612-333-3185
Party name: Kurt M. Anderson
Theodore H. Davis Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
1100 Peachtree Street
Suite 2800
Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

tdavis@kilpatricktownsend.com
4048156534
Party name: The American Intellectual Property Law Association