No. 18-3
Title:Robbie Ohlendorf, et al., Petitioners
v.
Local 876, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union
Docketed:June 28, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1864)
   Decision Date:February 22, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 30, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 30, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Aug 14 2018Brief of respondent Local 876, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2018Reply of petitioners Robbie Ohlendorf, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Amanda Kae Freeman
    Counsel of Record
The National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

akf@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Robbie Ohlendorf, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
John Douglas Korney
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of J. Douglas Korney
32300 Northwestern Highway, Suite 200
Farmington Hills, MI 48334

dkorney@dkorneylaw.com
248-865-9214
Party name: Local 876, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union