No. 18-285
Title:Missouri, Petitioner
v.
Phillip Douglass, et al.
Docketed:September 5, 2018
Linked with 18A97
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Missouri
   Case Numbers:(SC95719)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 1, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 20 2018Application (18A97) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2018 to September 28, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 26 2018Application (18A97) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 29, 2018.
Aug 29 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 5, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Oct 22 2018Response Requested. (Due November 21, 2018)
Nov 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 21, 2018 to December 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 21, 2018.
Dec 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 21, 2018 to January 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 22, 2019. See Rule 30.1.
Jan 16 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2019 to February 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 21, 2019.
Feb 11 2019Brief of respondents Phillip Douglass & Jennifer M. Gaulter in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondents Phillip Douglass & Jennifer M. Gaulter.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Missouri
Attorneys for Respondents
Clayton Evan Gillette
    Counsel of Record
Gillette Law Office, LLC
104 W 9th Street, Suite 404
Kansas City, MO 64105

clay@moappeals.com
8168952529
Party name: Phillip Douglass & Jennifer M. Gaulter
Clayton E. Gillette4646 Roanoke Parkway
Kansas City, MO 64112

816-561-3900
Party name: Phillip Douglass
John R. Humphrey121 West 63rd Street, Suite 201
Kansas City, MO 64113

816-333-2000
Party name: Jennifer M. Gaulter