No. 18-281
Title:Virginia House of Delegates, et al., Appellants
v.
Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Docketed:September 6, 2018
Linked with 18A629
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(3:14cv852)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 04 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Motion to dismiss filed by State Appellees'.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Opposition to appellees' motions to dismiss or affirm from appellants Virginia House of Delegates, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Oct 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits. In addition to the questions presented by the jurisdictional statement, the parties are directed to fully brief the following question: Whether appellants have standing to bring this appeal.
Dec 13 2018Application (18A629) for a stay pending appeal, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 14 2018Response to application (18A629) requested by The Chief Justice, due Thursday, December 20, 2018, by noon ET.
Dec 20 2018Response to application from respondents Virginia State Board of Elections, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2018Response to application from respondents Golden Bethune Hill, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain Document
Dec 21 2018Reply of applicant Virginia House of Delegates, et al. filed.
ReplyProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Virginia House of Delegates, et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 28 2018Joint appendix filed (9 volumes). (Statement of costs received)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Dec 28 2018Brief of appellants Virginia House of Delegates, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2019Brief amici curiae of Lee Chatfield, in His Official Capacity as Speaker-Elect of The Michigan House of Representatives, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 04 2019Brief amici curiae of American Legislative Exchange Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2019Application (18A629) referred to the Court.
Jan 08 2019Application (18A629) denied by the Court.
Jan 25 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, March 18, 2019
Jan 28 2019Brief of appellees Golden Bethune-Hill, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 28 2019Brief of State Appellees filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by appellees Bethune-Hill, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2019Joint motion for divided argument filed by appellees.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 04 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2019CIRCULATED
Feb 19 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Feb 19 2019Joint motion of appellees for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument GRANTED in part, and the time is divided as follows: 25 minutes for appellants, 10 minutes for the Solicitor General as amicus curiae, 10 minutes for appellees Virginia State Board of Elections, et al., and 15 minutes for appellees Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Feb 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist. of VA.
Feb 27 2019Reply of appellants Virginia House of Delegates, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2019The record received from U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist. of Virginia. (1 Envelop and 3 Boxes).
Mar 18 2019Argued. For appellants: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For United States, as amicus curiae: Morgan L. Ratner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For appellees Virginia State Board of Elections, et al.: Toby J. Heytens, Solicitor General of Virginia, Richmond, Va. For appellees Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.: Marc E. Elias, Washington, D. C.
Jun 17 2019Appeal dismissed. Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Thomas, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Virginia House of Delegates, et al.
Efrem M. BradenBaker &Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

mbraden@bakerlaw.com
202-861-1504
Party name: Virginia House of Delegates, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole, LLP
700 13th St, NW
Ste. 600
Washington, DC 20005-3960

melias@perkinscoie.com
202-434-1609
Party name: Golden Bethune-Hill, et al.
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23225

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
8047867240
Party name: Virginia State Board of Elections, James B. Alcorn, Virginia Department of Elections, Christopher E. Piper, Clara Belle Wheeler, Singleton B. McAllister
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: united states
Michael Courtney Keats
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

michael.keats@friedfrank.com
(212) 859-8914
Party name: The Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Marguerite Mary Leoni
    Counsel of Record
Nielsen Merksamer Parrinello Gross & Leoni LLP
2350 Kerner Blvd.
Suite 250
San Rafael, CA 94901

mleoni@nmgovlaw.com
415-389-6800
Party name: American Legislative Exchange Council, et al.
Kent Stephen Scheidegger
    Counsel of Record
Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn.
2131 L Street
Sacramento, CA 95816

Kent.Scheidegger@cjlf.org
9164460345
Party name: Criminal Justice Legal Foundation
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: LEE CHATFIELD, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SPEAKER-ELECT OF THE MICHIGAN HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, AARON MILLER, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS A MEMBER OF THE MICHIGAN HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, JACK BERGMAN, BILL HUIZENGA, JOHN MOOLENAAR, FRED UPTON, TIM WALBERG, PAUL MITCHELL, GEORGE HOLDING, VIRGINIA FOXX, MARK WALKER, DAVID ROUZER, RICHARD HUDSON, PATRICK McHENRY, MARK MEADOWS, AND TED BUDD