No. 18-280
Title:New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
City of New York, New York, et al.
Docketed:September 6, 2018
Linked with 17A1393
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-638)
   Decision Date:February 23, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:April 5, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2018Application (17A1393) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2018 to August 3, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jun 21 2018Application (17A1393) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 3, 2018.
Jul 19 2018Application (17A1393) to extend further the time from August 3, 2018 to September 2, 2018, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Application (17A1393) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 4, 2018.
Sep 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 9, 2018 to November 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 8, 2018.
Sep 28 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Western States Sheriffs' Association et al filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Louisiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 09 2018Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2018Brief of City of New York, et al. in opposition not accepted for filing. (November 09, 2018) (Corrected version submitted November 9, 2018).
Nov 08 2018Brief of respondents City of New York, et al. in opposition filed.(11/14/2018)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Nov 28 2018Reply of petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 22 2019Petition GRANTED.
Feb 12 2019Joint motion for an extension of time for filing the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Feb 21 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 25 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including May 7, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Mar 11 2019Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of New York, et al.
Blanket Consent
Apr 12 2019Motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance filed by respondents City of New York, et al. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 19 2019Response to motion from petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Apr 23 2019Reply in support of motion filed.
Main Document
Apr 29 2019Motion of respondents to hold briefing schedule in abeyance DENIED.
May 07 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received)
Main Document
May 07 2019Brief of petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of National African American Gun Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Pink Pistols filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Madison Society Foundation, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Academics for the Second Amendment filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Law Professors in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Brady and Team ENOUGH in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Liberal Gun Club filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of The States of Louisiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of George K. Young filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain DocumentProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Patrick J. Charles in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Robert Leider filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated and Gun Owners of California, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of Black Guns Matter filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Bradley Byrne and 119 Additional Members of the United States House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, and the Calguns Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
May 14 2019Brief amici curiae of National Sheriffs Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2019Letter dated July 3, 2019 of City of New York, et al. not accepted for filing. (July 08, 2019)
Jul 08 2019Response of New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. to motion not accepted for filing. (July 08, 2019)
Jul 22 2019Suggestion of Mootness filed by respondents City of New York, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Jul 22 2019Motion for a further extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 24 2019Response of petitioners to motion for a further extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 26 2019Motion for a further extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits denied.
Aug 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 01 2019Petitioners' response to suggestion of mootness filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 05 2019Brief of respondents City of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2019Respondents' Supplemental Appendix of City of New York, et al. not accepted for filing. (August 09, 2019)
Aug 05 2019Supplemental appendix to respondents’ brief on the merits filed. (Corrected copies 8/9/19)
Main Document
Aug 07 2019Suggestion of mootness DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 08 2019Respondents' reply in support of suggestion of mootness filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 12 2019Amicus brief of March for Our Lives Action Fund not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of March for Our Lives Action Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of States of New York, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, New Jersey, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, and Virginia and the District of Columbia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Public Health Researchers and Social Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of 139 Members of the United States House of Representatives filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Senator Sheldon Whitehouse, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Amicus brief of Neal Goldfarb not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted)
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of National League of Cities, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Corpus Linguistics Professors and Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Former Commissioner of the New York City Police Department William J. Bratton filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Crime Commission of New York City filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amici curiae of National Education Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Everytown for Gun Safety filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Americans Against Gun Violence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Neal Goldfarb filed. (August 13, 2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2019Motion of Neal Goldfarb for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 04 2019Reply of petitioners New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, December 2, 2019.
Oct 07 2019The Respondent's Suggestion of Mootness is denied. The question of mootness will be subject to further consideration at oral argument, and the parties should be prepared to discuss it.
Oct 15 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 15 2019Motion of Neal Goldfarb for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: New York State Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
New York City Law Department
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

rdearing@law.nyc.gov
2123562500
Party name: City of New York, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Roberto Jose Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K St., NW
Washington, DC 20006-1047

rgonzalez@paulweiss.com
202-223-7300
Party name: Former Commissioner of the New York City Police Department William J. Bratton
Kenneth Alan Klukowski
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Rights Union
3213 Duke Street #625
Alexandria, VA 22314

kklukowski@theacru.org
877-730-2278
Party name: American Civil Rights Union
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Louisiana Dept. of Justice
1885 North Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: The States of Louisiana, et al.
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
703-352-7276
Party name: Western States Sheriffs' Association et al
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Robert Leider
Chris Fedeli
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
Judicial Watch, Inc., 425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

cfedeli@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Ira M. Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
390 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017

ira.feinberg@hoganlovells.com
(212)-918-3000
Party name: March for Our Lives Action Fund
John Steven Foley
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of J. Steven Foley
11 Pleasant Street, Suite 100
Worcester, MA 01609

jsteven@attorneyfoley.com
508-754-1041
Party name: Black Guns Matter
Neal Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
1301 Fairmont St NW
Washington, DC 20009-6940

goldfarbneal@gmail.com
2022627886
Party name: Neal Goldfarb
Luke W. Goodrich
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave. N.W.
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

lgoodrich@becketlaw.org
2029550095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Public Health Researchers and Social Scientists
John Michael Grenfell
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
22nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

john.grenfell@pillsburylaw.com
415-983-1488
Party name: Patrick J. Charles
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Everytown for Gun Safety
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
7038359085
Party name: Commonwealth Second Amendment, Inc.
Stephen Porter Halbrook
    Counsel of Record
Stephen P. Halbrook, PH.D.Attorney at Law
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

protell@aol.com
703-352-7276
Party name: National African American Gun Association, Inc.
David T. Hardy
    Counsel of Record
8987 E. Tanque Verde
No. 265
Tucson, AZ 85749

dthardy@mindspring.com
520-749-0241
Party name: Academics for the Second Amendment
Fred J. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation
3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1
Sacramento, CA 95817

fred@fjh-law.com
9164485100
Party name: Americans Against Gun Violence
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-415-7412
Party name: Firearms Policy Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Calguns Foundation
David D. Jensen
    Counsel of Record
David Jensen PLLC
111 John Street
Suite 420
New York, NY 10038

david@djensenpllc.com
212-380-6615
Party name: The Liberal Gun Club
Donald E. J. Kilmer Jr.
    Counsel of Record
1645 Willow Street
Suite 150
San Jose, CA 95125

don@dklawoffice.com
(408) 348-6068
Party name: The Madison Society Foundation, Inc.
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
3032796536
Party name: Professors of Second Amendment Law, et al.
Brian Stuart Koukoutchos
    Counsel of Record
28 Eagle Trace
Mandeville, LA 70471

bkoukoutchos@gmail.com
985 626 5052
Party name: Pink Pistols
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Constitutional Law Professors
Brian Robert Matsui
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bmatsui@mofo.com
202-887-8784
Party name: Corpus Linguistics Professors and Experts
C. D. Michel
    Counsel of Record
Michel & Associates, P.C.
180 East Ocean Boulevard
Suite 200
Long Beach, CA 90802

cmichel@michellawyers.com
(562) 216-4444
Party name: California Rifle & Pistol Association, Incorporated
Benjamin Charles Mizer
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

bmizer@jonesday.com
2028793939
Party name: Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Education Association
1201 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7035
Party name: National Education Association
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, Tennessee Firearms Association, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
William Jeffrey OlsonWilliam J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Downsize DC Foundation, DownsizeDC.org, and Restoring Liberty Action Committee
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
7034253741
Party name: National Sheriffs Association, et al.
Eddie Travis Ramey
    Counsel of Record
Burr & Forman LLP
420 North 20th Street, Wells Fargo Tower, Suite 3400
Birmingham, AL 35203

tramey@burr.com
205-251-3000
Party name: Bradley Byrne and 119 Additional Members of the United States House of Representatives
Lawrence Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
Chapman University. Fowler School of Law
One University Drive
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

rosentha@chapman.edu
7146282650
Party name: National League of Cities, United States Conference of Mayors, International Municipal Lawyers Association
Harry Sandick
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

hsandick@pbwt.com
(212)336-2000
Party name: Citizens Crime Commission of New York City
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: Cato Institute
Stephen Dean Stamboulieh
    Counsel of Record
Stamboulieh Law, PLLC
PO Box 4008
Madison, MS 39130

stephen@sdslaw.us
601-852-3440
Party name: George K. Young
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: States of New York, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, New Jersey, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, and Virginia and the District of Columbia
Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

donald.verrilli@mto.com
202-220-1101
Party name: Second Amendment Law Professors
Avi Weitzman
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

aweitzman@gibsondunn.com
2123512465
Party name: 139 Members of the United States House of Representatives
Sheldon Whitehouse
    Counsel of Record
Hart Senate Office Bldg., Rm. 530
Washington, DC 20510

counsel@whitehouse.senate.gov
(202) 224-2921
Party name: Senator Sheldon Whitehouse et al.
Cristen Alice Wohlgemuth
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cristen@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Paul Reinherz Quitman Wolfson
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
2026636390
Party name: Brady and Team ENOUGH