No. 18-273
Title:Ramon Andrew Williams, aka Andrew Denton Williamson, Petitioner
v.
Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General
Docketed:September 4, 2018
Linked with 18A7
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3816, 17-1705)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 26 2018Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jun 26 2018Application (18A7) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2018 to August 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jul 02 2018Application (18A7) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 30, 2018.
Aug 30 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 4, 2018)
Sep 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2018 to November 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Sep 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 5, 2018.
Oct 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 5, 2018 to December 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 5, 2018.
Dec 04 2018Brief of respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5380
Party name: Ramon Andrew Williams
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting Attorney General